IN HB1353 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Financial institutions and consumer credit. Makes various changes to the statutes concerning: (1) first lien mortgage lenders; (2) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code (UCCC); (3) civil proceeding advance payment providers; (4) debt management companies; (5) banks; (6) credit unions; (7) pawnbrokers; (8) money transmitters; and (9) licensed cashers of checks. Repeals a provision in the statute governing credit unions that concerns loans made by a credit union to the credit union's individual directors and committee members. Amends a provision in the statute governing credit unions that concerns loans made by a credit union to the credit union's individual officers to: (1) include extensions of credit made to the credit union's individual directors and supervisory committee members (and to the immediate family members and related interests of the credit union's individual directors and supervisory committee members); and (2) specify that such extensions of credit shall be made in accordance with Regulation O of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Provides that an appraisal required in connection with a real estate mortgage loan to a credit union member must be: (1) a written appraisal; or (2) a written estimate of market value; consistent with the appraisal standards and transaction value limitations set forth in the appraisal regulations of the National Credit Union Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions and consumer credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 129
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-09HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Zay and Breaux
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bassler and Ford J.D.
2020-03-05HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Zay added as second sponsor
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bassler
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseRepresentatives Hamilton and Heaton added as coauthors
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-29HouseRepresentative Chyung added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2020-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1353/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/f/e/03fe0d43/HB1353.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/a/1/b9a1a2af/HB1353.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/5/c/335c9b37/HB1353.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/7/5/8c75b663/HB1353.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/9/0/8e901f0c/HB1353.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/6/1/f761904d/HB1353.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/3/3/cc33c444/HB1353.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/c/9c6ceeb5/HB1353.167_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/b/d/b4bd94a6/HB1353.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/4/3/bb437521/HB1353.315_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/2/f/2d2f72e7/HB1353.346_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback