IN HB1350 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 268
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gaming. Authorizes advance deposit wagering on horse racing. Provides that each permit holder shall pay to the Indiana horse racing commission (IHRC) as an advance deposit wagering fee an amount equal to 60% of the net source market fee received by the permit holder from a licensed secondary pari-mutuel organization (SPMO). Provides that the IHRC shall use this revenue as follows: (1) 25% of the revenue shall be used to promote horse racing conducted at the state fair and at county fairs. (2) 75% of the revenue shall be distributed to different horsemen's associations to encourage Indiana horse owners and

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming. Authorizes advance deposit wagering on horse racing. Provides that each permit holder shall pay to the Indiana horse racing commission (IHRC) as an advance deposit wagering fee an amount equal to 60% of the net source market fee received by the permit holder from a licensed secondary pari-mutuel organization (SPMO). Provides that the IHRC shall use this revenue as follows: (1) 25% of the revenue shall be used to promote horse racing conducted at the state fair and at county fairs. (2) 75% of the revenue shall be distributed to different horsemen's associations to encourage Indiana horse owners and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HousePublic Law 268
2017-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 528: yeas 32, nays 18
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 553: yeas 52, nays 44
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Brown T added as conferee
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative Brown T removed as advisor
2017-04-21HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta removed as conferee
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ford, Taylor G, Kenley and Perfect
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Niezgodski
2017-04-12HouseRepresentatives Pressel and Eberhart added as advisors
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Brown T, Frye R, Arnold L, Engleman, Sullivan, Bauer and Dvorak
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Huston and GiaQuinta
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 416: yeas 28, nays 20
2017-04-03SenateAmendment #1 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-13SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-21HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as coauthor
2017-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Ford and Kenley
2017-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 74, nays 22
2017-02-20HouseAmendment #9 (Frye R) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-20HouseAmendment #8 (Huston) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 65, nays 30
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-13HouseRepresentative Sullivan added as coauthor
2017-02-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-02-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-12HouseRepresentative Brown, T. added as coauthor
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Huston

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1350/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/8/3/d183129b/HB1350.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/f/1/5cf18ba7/HB1350.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/2/0/f820d544/HB1350.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/c/5/c1c59fce/HB1350.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/0/3/660323c3/HB1350.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/4/7/eb472be7/HB1350.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/b/0/20b0be6f/HB1350.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/7/f/127f7281/HB1350.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/1/d/fb1d5834/HB1350.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/8/6/ef86f3ac/HB1350.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/0/7/4b07bb0c/HB1350.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/a/3/c3a36b45/HB1350.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/2/7/75273f5c/HB1350.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/3/3/2933f805/HB1350.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/8/8/f7882aac/HB1350.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/a/5/6ba513fe/HB1350.177.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/0/1/c5015205/HB1350.04.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/e/7/c5e78d7c/HB1350.416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/7/e/e67e72e9/HB1350.528.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/9/5/7f95c2c9/HB1350.553.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback