IN HB1335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State institutions. Includes the Neurodiagnostic Institute and Advanced Treatment Center as a state institution. Allows for the instruction of medical students at all state institutions. (Current law allows for instruction of medical students only at Larue D. Carter Memorial Hospital.) Authorizes the director of the division of mental health and addiction to contract for the management and clinical operation of any state institution, including contracting with an entity for services. (Current law allows for only Larue D. Carter Memorial Hospital.)
Title
State institutions. Includes the Neurodiagnostic Institute and Advanced Treatment Center as a state institution. Allows for the instruction of medical students at all state institutions. (Current law allows for instruction of medical students only at Larue D. Carter Memorial Hospital.) Authorizes the director of the division of mental health and addiction to contract for the management and clinical operation of any state institution, including contracting with an entity for services. (Current law allows for only Larue D. Carter Memorial Hospital.)
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 19 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-02-09 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Charbonneau |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment #2 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |