IN HB1329 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 06/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 06/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county and a health care provider to enter into a reimbursement agreement for a lower reimbursement rate than the statutory rate for health care services provided to individuals subject to lawful detention. Removes expiration dates of applicable statutes.
Title
Liability for county detainee health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 06/29/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 205 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 648: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 1 (Wyss), prevailed; | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss and Arnold | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-07 | Representatives Mahan and L. Lawson added as coauthors | |
2011-02-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Dermody |