IN HB1318 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Communications services and energy production. Eliminates the state requirement that a communications service provider allow a physical connection by other providers to its system. Establishes a uniform statewide procedure for applications for and issuance of permits for the construction and modification of structures and facilities for the provision of wireless communications service. Specifies that local planning and zoning laws apply to the issuance of permits for communications structures and facilities under the new provisions. Requires applications for permits to show evidence of compliance with criteria set forth in applicable zoning ordinances with respect to special exceptions, special uses, contingent uses,
Title
Communications services and energy production. Eliminates the state requirement that a communications service provider allow a physical connection by other providers to its system. Establishes a uniform statewide procedure for applications for and issuance of permits for the construction and modification of structures and facilities for the provision of wireless communications service. Specifies that local planning and zoning laws apply to the issuance of permits for communications structures and facilities under the new provisions. Requires applications for permits to show evidence of compliance with criteria set forth in applicable zoning ordinances with respect to special exceptions, special uses, contingent uses,
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 145 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 514: yeas 90, nays 1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 460: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Hershman added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 84, nays 14 |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |