IN HB1308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid recovery audits. Sets forth requirements for Medicaid recovery audits of Medicaid providers.
Title
Medicaid recovery audits. Sets forth requirements for Medicaid recovery audits of Medicaid providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 134 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 475: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bassler and Becker |
2019-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Representatives Zent, Davisson, Fleming added as coauthors |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |