IN HB1302 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expungement. Provides that expungement provisions concerning an arrest that does not lead to a conviction also apply to criminal charges or juvenile delinquency allegations that do not lead to a conviction. Specifies that a person who files for expungement of an arrest, charge, or juvenile delinquency adjudication that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication may file the petition in a circuit or superior court. Provides that a person who files for the expungement of an arrest, criminal charge, or juvenile delinquency allegation that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication is not required
Title
Expungement. Provides that expungement provisions concerning an arrest that does not lead to a conviction also apply to criminal charges or juvenile delinquency allegations that do not lead to a conviction. Specifies that a person who files for expungement of an arrest, charge, or juvenile delinquency adjudication that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication may file the petition in a circuit or superior court. Provides that a person who files for the expungement of an arrest, criminal charge, or juvenile delinquency allegation that did not lead to a conviction or juvenile delinquency adjudication is not required
Sponsors
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 142 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 501: yeas 80, nays 5 |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-03 | House | Senator Taylor added as second sponsor |
2015-02-03 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2015-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 86, nays 8 |
2015-02-02 | House | Amendment #1 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | Representatives Pierce and Summers added as coauthorss |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin |