IN HB1289 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Massage therapy. Provides that an individual must be licensed by the state board of massage therapy (board) to practice massage therapy. (Under current law, massage therapists are certified by the board but certification is not required to practice massage therapy.) Provides that massage therapy licensing requirements do not prohibit specified conduct of individuals who meet certain requirements. Amends the definition of "massage therapy" to include certain acts. Amends the definition of "massage therapist" to include an individual who offers to provide massage therapy. Provides that an individual may not use certain titles or practice massage therapy without a license. Establishes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage therapy. Provides that an individual must be licensed by the state board of massage therapy (board) to practice massage therapy. (Under current law, massage therapists are certified by the board but certification is not required to practice massage therapy.) Provides that massage therapy licensing requirements do not prohibit specified conduct of individuals who meet certain requirements. Amends the definition of "massage therapy" to include certain acts. Amends the definition of "massage therapist" to include an individual who offers to provide massage therapy. Provides that an individual may not use certain titles or practice massage therapy without a license. Establishes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HousePublic Law 267
2017-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 480: yeas 78, nays 10
2017-04-11HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateSenator Hershman added as cosponsor
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 415: yeas 28, nays 20
2017-04-05SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2017-04-05SenateSenator Head added as cosponsor
2017-04-05SenateSenator Leising added as second sponsor
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Becker
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 75, nays 19
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-09HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor
2017-02-09HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2017-01-30HouseRepresentative Ober added as coauthor
2017-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2017-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1289/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/c/2/09c24884/HB1289.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/e/6f7ecc25/HB1289.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/3/2/1832db13/HB1289.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/1/a/ad1a25e8/HB1289.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/a/a/9caaf9e8/HB1289.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/0/e/f40ece69/HB1289.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/c/53bccfd6/HB1289.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/7/4/b37479a4/HB1289.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/2/d/642d3b54/HB1289.235.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/9/9/c599061e/HB1289.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/7/c/827c35f7/HB1289.415.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/3/4/5d344ec3/HB1289.480.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback