IN HB1281 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various higher education matters. Allows the commission for higher education (commission) to extend, with limitations, eligibility for certain grants or reductions in tuition or fees for recipients who used the grants or reductions in tuition or fees at postsecondary educational institutions that have closed. Amends provisions regarding renewal of certain scholarships and tuition and fee remissions. Changes the term "professional degree program" to "professional degree program or accelerated graduate degree program" and amends the definition. Amends the provision regarding the use of renewals and extensions of certain grants or reductions in tuition or fees for professional degree programs or accelerated
Title
Various higher education matters. Allows the commission for higher education (commission) to extend, with limitations, eligibility for certain grants or reductions in tuition or fees for recipients who used the grants or reductions in tuition or fees at postsecondary educational institutions that have closed. Amends provisions regarding renewal of certain scholarships and tuition and fee remissions. Changes the term "professional degree program" to "professional degree program or accelerated graduate degree program" and amends the definition. Amends the provision regarding the use of renewals and extensions of certain grants or reductions in tuition or fees for professional degree programs or accelerated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 191 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 460: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Representatives Wesco, Klinker, Smith, V. added as coauthors |
2017-01-30 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz |
2017-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | Representatives Behning, Huston, Porter added as coauthors |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Sullivan |