IN HB1278 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation networks. Requires a transportation network company to have a permit issued by the Indiana department of state revenue to provide a digital network for connection to prearranged rides in Indiana. Specifies requirements related to: (1) criminal and driving history; (2) drug and alcohol use; (3) vehicle equipment; (4) insurance; (5) fares; (6) privacy; (7) nondiscrimination and accessibility; (8) record maintenance; (9) TNC and TNC driver conduct; and (10) regulation.
Title
Transportation networks. Requires a transportation network company to have a permit issued by the Indiana department of state revenue to provide a digital network for connection to prearranged rides in Indiana. Specifies requirements related to: (1) criminal and driving history; (2) drug and alcohol use; (3) vehicle equipment; (4) insurance; (5) fares; (6) privacy; (7) nondiscrimination and accessibility; (8) record maintenance; (9) TNC and TNC driver conduct; and (10) regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] |
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 175 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 510: yeas 43, nays 5 |
2015-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 527: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Hershman, Arnold J and Crider |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Yoder and Mrvan |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Soliday, Speedy, Austin and Forestal |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Hale |
2015-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | House | Concurrence withdrawn |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 419: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor |
2015-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-02-02 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 60: yeas 29, nays 65 |
2015-02-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Austin and Hale |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |