IN HB1267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Representative Torr added as coauthor.
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Representative Torr added as coauthor.
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that on January 1, 2019, in all counties (except Marion County) all townships are consolidated into a single township (consolidated township). On January 1, 2019, in all counties (except Marion County) the offices of township trustee and township board of the former townships are eliminated and their powers, duties, and responsibilities are transferred to the offices of township trustee and township board of the consolidated township. Provides that at the 2018 general election and every four years thereafter: (1) a three member township board is elected at large to serve as the legislative and fiscal body of the consolidated township; and (2) a township trustee is elected to serve as the executive of the consolidated township. Transfers assets, debts, property rights, equipment, records, personnel, and contracts of the eliminated townships to the consolidated townships. Provides that for budgets of the consolidated townships adopted for 2019 and thereafter: (1) the township's budget, property tax levies, and rate must be reviewed and approved by the county fiscal body; and (2) the county fiscal body may reduce and modify but not increase the budget in formulating the final proposed township budget, levies, and rate. Provides that: (1) the consolidated township may levy property taxes to pay township indebtedness or lease rental obligations incurred by an eliminated township only in the geographic area of the eliminated township that originally issued the debt or entered into the lease rental agreement; and (2) the territory of the eliminated township comprises a taxing district for the purpose of paying the indebtedness or obligation. Allows the consolidated township to levy taxes for the payment of pension debt and obligations only within the
Title
Consolidation of township governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Negele added as author. |
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Karickhoff removed as author. |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1267/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/c/3/e4c31ef4/HB1267.01.INTR.pdf |