IN HB1266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 248
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 248
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sediment and erosion control in construction. Provides that a review authority (an MS4 community or a soil and water conservation district) to which a construction plan is submitted must make a preliminary determination whether the construction plan is substantially complete: (1) before the end of the tenth working day after the day on which the construction plan is submitted in the case of a small construction activity site (one at which construction results in land disturbance of at least one but less than five acres) or very small construction activity site (one at which construction results in land disturbance of less than one acre); or (2) before the end of the fourteenth working day after the day on which the construction plan is submitted in the case of a large construction activity site (one at which construction activities result in land disturbance of at least five acres). Provides that if a review authority to which a construction plan is submitted does not notify the project site owner before the end of the tenth or fourteenth working day (whichever applies) of its preliminary determination whether the construction plan is substantially complete, the project site owner may submit a notice of intent letter and, 48 hours later, may begin the construction project. Provides that an MS4 community may require erosion and sediment control measures at a very small construction activity site but that the control measures may not be more stringent than the control measures required at a small construction activity site by administrative rules or the general permit that will be issued by the department of environmental management (IDEM).Establishes minimum qualifications for an individual who begins employment after July 1, 2019, reviewing and making conclusive determinations concerning construction plans submitted to an MS4 community. Provides that if an MS4 community has made a conclusive favorable determination concerning a construction plan and work on the construction project has begun, the MS4 community may not order work on the construction project to stop on the grounds that the erosion and sediment control measures are not adequate unless the project site owner is notified in writing of the inadequacies and the inadequacies are not resolved within 72 hours. Provides that the general permit that will be issued by the department of environmental management to establish erosion and sediment control requirements for construction sites, to the extent allowed under federal law, must recognize and be consistent with these provisions.
Title
Sediment and erosion control in construction. Provides that a review authority (an MS4 community or a soil and water conservation district) to which a construction plan is submitted must make a preliminary determination whether the construction plan is substantially complete: (1) before the end of the tenth working day after the day on which the construction plan is submitted in the case of a small construction activity site (one at which construction results in land disturbance of at least one but less than five acres) or very small construction activity site (one at which construction results in land disturbance of less than one acre); or (2) before the end of the fourteenth working day after the day on which the construction plan is submitted in the case of a large construction activity site (one at which construction activities result in land disturbance of at least five acres). Provides that if a review authority to which a construction plan is submitted does not notify the project site owner before the end of the tenth or fourteenth working day (whichever applies) of its preliminary determination whether the construction plan is substantially complete, the project site owner may submit a notice of intent letter and, 48 hours later, may begin the construction project. Provides that an MS4 community may require erosion and sediment control measures at a very small construction activity site but that the control measures may not be more stringent than the control measures required at a small construction activity site by administrative rules or the general permit that will be issued by the department of environmental management (IDEM).Establishes minimum qualifications for an individual who begins employment after July 1, 2019, reviewing and making conclusive determinations concerning construction plans submitted to an MS4 community. Provides that if an MS4 community has made a conclusive favorable determination concerning a construction plan and work on the construction project has begun, the MS4 community may not order work on the construction project to stop on the grounds that the erosion and sediment control measures are not adequate unless the project site owner is notified in writing of the inadequacies and the inadequacies are not resolved within 72 hours. Provides that the general permit that will be issued by the department of environmental management to establish erosion and sediment control requirements for construction sites, to the extent allowed under federal law, must recognize and be consistent with these provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. David Wolkins [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 248 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 508: yeas 62, nays 27 |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 403: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Lanane) failed; voice vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Doriot |
2019-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 68, nays 27 |
2019-02-04 | House | Representative Wolkins added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Representative Hatfield added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |