IN HB1263 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that for assessment dates occurring after February 28, 2015, a parcel's land value may not be increased by more than 5% of the most recently determined land value that applied to the parcel for the preceding assessment date. Provides that in a review or appeal of an assessment initiated after June 30, 2014, the county assessor or township assessor making the assessment has the burden of proving that the assessment is correct and in any appeals taken to the Indiana board of tax review or to the Indiana tax court.
Title
Property tax matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Kersey. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1263/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/8/b/e18b14ce/HB1263.01.INTR.pdf |