IN HB1260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies certain requirements and recommendations for school corporation employee health coverage programs.
Title
School corporation health insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Rep. Eric Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), prevailed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Battles), failed (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Austin), failed (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), prevailed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Battles), failed (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Austin), failed (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 200 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 651: yeas 73, nays 16 | |
2011-04-14 | Representative Cherry added as coauthor | |
2011-04-14 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 41 and nays 8 | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment 1 (Charbonneau), prevailed; | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Senator Hershman added as third sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 81, nays 12 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), prevailed; Roll Call 271: yeas 91, nays 8 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 1 (Battles), failed; Roll Call 270: yeas 38, nays 58 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 3 (Austin), failed; Roll Call 269: yeas 37, nays 58 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | |
2011-02-08 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Representatives Goodin and Porter added as coauthors | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Turner added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Dermody |