IN HB1257 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State use program. Changes references of "person with a severe disability" to "individual with a disability" in the public purchasing laws and the laws concerning the committee for the purchase of products and services of individuals with a disability (committee). Defines "individual with a disability". Amends the definition of "qualified agency". Provides that a governmental body's purchasing agent must determine if a product or service is within 10% of the fair market price. Adds a nonvoting member to the committee who represents a central coordinating agency. Amends the requirements for a state use products and services catalog. Requires the committee
Title
State use program. Changes references of "person with a severe disability" to "individual with a disability" in the public purchasing laws and the laws concerning the committee for the purchase of products and services of individuals with a disability (committee). Defines "individual with a disability". Amends the definition of "qualified agency". Provides that a governmental body's purchasing agent must determine if a product or service is within 10% of the fair market price. Adds a nonvoting member to the committee who represents a central coordinating agency. Amends the requirements for a state use products and services catalog. Requires the committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 37 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Zay added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senators Bohacek and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Becker |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-23 | House | Representatives Porter, Karickhoff, Clere added as coauthors |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Heaton |