IN HB1254 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of motor vehicle dealer and manufacturer licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of motor vehicle dealer and manufacturer licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 166
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-03SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-02-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-18SenateSenator Yoder removed as second sponsor
2016-02-09SenateSenator Arnold added as cosponsor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
2016-02-08SenateSenator Buck added as third sponsor
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Yoder
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 92, nays 3
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as coauthor
2016-01-12HouseRepresentative Bauer removed as coauthor
2016-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2016-01-11HouseCoauthored by Representatives Karickhoff, Koch and Bauer
2016-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Mahan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1254/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/8/a/878a2087/HB1254.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/8/b/eb8bdf39/HB1254.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/1/e/971ef23e/HB1254.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/4/3/fc43ab32/HB1254.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/6/9/8d69411e/HB1254.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/3/1/5a314ef5/HB1254.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/6/7/5767d64c/HB1254.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/d/1/ecd1d8d0/HB1254.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/c/4/26c4b7f1/HB1254.147.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/f/4/82f4e31e/HB1254.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/b/d/ddbd9b30/HB1254.280.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback