IN HB1251 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Requires the department of education (department) to apply to the United States Department of Education for assessment flexibility. Requires the department to: (1) prepare a report that includes information and recommendations regarding establishing and implementing a parent-teacher compact program; and (2) submit the report to the legislative council not later than November 1, 2022. Provides that the state board of education (state board) shall, in consultation with postsecondary educational institutions and various businesses and industries, identify what skills or traits students need to be successful upon completion of high school. Requires the department to conduct a research study regarding academic standards. Requires the department to establish an online adjunct teacher portal. Provides that the governing body of a school corporation may issue an adjunct teacher permit to an individual who meets certain requirements. Establishes requirements for adjunct teacher employment agreements. Provides that the employment agreements are not subject to certain requirements regarding teacher salaries and school corporation local compensation plans. Provides that: (1) an adjunct teacher is not a school employee for purposes of collective bargaining; and (2) an employment agreement with an adjunct teacher is not subject to a collective bargaining agreement. Provides that the school employer shall discuss the use of adjunct teachers with the exclusive representative of certificated employees. Requires the governing body of a school corporation to announce any vacant adjunct teacher positions at meetings of the governing body. Amends the definition of "primary use of the building" for certain applicable high schools for purposes of occupancy classification requirements. Amends the definition of "appropriate vehicle". Provides that a special purpose bus or an appropriate vehicle may be used to transport students under certain circumstances. Provides that the state board may adopt emergency rules relating to school accreditation. Provides that the driver of a special purpose bus or an appropriate vehicle must pass an expanded criminal history check and an expanded child protection index check. Makes changes to visual acuity requirements for a bus driver. Establishes the Indiana student enrichment grant program (program). Provides that an enrichment student is eligible to establish an Indiana enrichment scholarship account. Provides that an enrichment student may receive $1,000 to be used for certain qualified expenses. Provides that the department shall administer the program. Provides that the program expires July 1, 2025.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Michelle Davis [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Public Law 168 |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 375: yeas 33, nays 17 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 395: yeas 70, nays 28 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as conferee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Rogers removed as advisor |
2022-03-08 | House | Representative Goodrich added as conferee |
2022-03-08 | House | Representative Smith V removed as conferee |
2022-03-08 | House | Representative Goodrich removed as advisor |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Byrne, Qaddoura and Rogers |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Ford J.D. |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Goodrich and DeLaney |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2022-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 34, nays 14 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 273: yeas 14, nays 36 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 272: yeas 12, nays 38 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 271: yeas 12, nays 38 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Young M) failed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 73, nays 17 |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 132: yeas 28, nays 63 |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | House | Representatives Carbaugh, Davis M, Goodrich added as coauthors |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |