IN HB1234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 15 effective 03/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 15 effective 03/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court to include as a condition of bail the requirement that a defendant charged with a violent crime that results in bodily injury to a person refrain from any direct or indirect contact with the victim for 10 days after release or until the initial hearing, whichever occurs first, if the defendant is released to bail without the court having held a bail hearing in open court. Prohibits certain persons from making certain determinations concerning the remains of a decedent if the decedent had filed a protection order against the person and the protection order currently is in effect. Provides that a pharmacist, pharmacy technician, or person authorized by a pharmacist to dispense a controlled substance may not dispense a controlled substance in a retail pharmacy to a person who is not personally known to the pharmacist, pharmacy technician, or person authorized by a pharmacist to dispense a controlled substance unless the person taking possession of the controlled substance provides documented proof of the person's identification to the pharmacist, pharmacy technician, or person authorized by a pharmacist to dispense a controlled substance. Provides that a court may require a person convicted of domestic battery to complete a certified batterer's intervention program. Provides that a court may require a person charged with domestic violence to wear a GPS tracking device as a condition of bail. Provides that 211 telephone services shall include assistance with parental stress issues. Specifies that: (1) records concerning communicable diseases may be disclosed; and (2) patient records that have been classified as confidential are not required to be made available for inspection after 75 years (as required for other confidential records). Sets parameters that a public agency must follow when creating exceptions for the disclosure of records. Provides an exception to the human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) testing consent statute. Provides that if a victim of certain crimes requests that a defendant be tested for HIV, the defendant must be tested.
Title
Criminal procedures and controlled substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Section 15 effective 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 7 through 14 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 6 effective 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 1 through 5 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 94 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 285: Yeas 48, Nays 2 | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 303: Yeas 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-02 | Senate advisors appointed: Zakas, Deig and Leising | |
2010-03-02 | Senate conferee appointed: Becker and Lanane | |
2010-03-01 | House advisors appointed: VanDenburgh, Pierce, Pond and Culver | |
2010-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Reske and Foley | |
2010-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: Yeas 49 and Nays 1 | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 3 (Deig), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Senators Head and Holdman added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Senators Zakas, Broden, Breaux and Randolph added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Representatives Bischoff and Pearson added as coauthors | |
2010-01-26 | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker and Lanane | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Representative VanDenburgh added as coauthor | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: Yeas 90, Nays 5 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 1 (Foley), failed; Roll Call 62: Yeas 45, Nays 48 | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Representative Reske |