IN HB1224 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Craft hemp flower and hemp production. Excludes craft hemp flower from the definition of "hemp product". Removes references to smokable hemp. Provides that the state seed commissioner may not adopt or enforce a rule that is more strict than required under federal law or regulation. Removes an exemption to a person who knowingly or intentionally grows or handles smokeable hemp without a license from the penalty of growing or handling hemp without a license. Repeals a law that requires that a hemp bud or a hemp flower be sold only to a processor licensed in Indiana. Provides that a food is not considered adulterated for containing low THC hemp extract or craft hemp flower. Creates contaminant testing and packaging requirements for the distribution and sale of craft hemp flower. Establishes penalties for selling or distributing craft hemp flower in violation of the requirements. Makes it a Class C infraction if a person knowingly: (1) sells or distributes craft hemp flower to a person less than 21 years of age; and (2) purchases craft hemp flower for delivery to another person who is less than 21 years of age. Provides that a retail establishment that sells or distributes craft hemp flower to a person less than 21 years of age commits a Class C infraction. Makes it a Class C infraction if a person less than 21 years of age: (1) purchases craft hemp flower; (2) accepts craft hemp flower for personal use; or (3) possesses craft hemp flower on his or her person. Provides that a person who, while a motor vehicle is in operation or located on the right-of-way of a public highway, possesses a container that contains craft hemp flower, and: (1) the container does not have tamper evident packaging; or (2) the tamper evident packaging has a broken seal; commits a Class C infraction. Provides that a violation is not considered a moving violation. Defines "craft hemp flower". Provides that craft hemp flower is not included in the definition of "controlled substance analog", "hashish", "low THC hemp extract", or "marijuana". Repeals the definition of "smokable hemp" and criminal penalties concerning smokable hemp. Makes conforming changes. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft hemp flower and hemp production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2021-02-22SenateSenator Garten removed as second sponsor
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Garten, Tallian
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 69, nays 28
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Karickhoff, Bartels, Moed
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Eberhart

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1224/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/4/4/a0447390/HB1224.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/e/e/68eecc51/HB1224.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/4/c/0b4c5765/HB1224.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/7/c/977cdf03/HB1224.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/1/5/bc15feb0/HB1224.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/7/e/687e4fc7/HB1224.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/5/4/af5430a1/HB1224.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/9/3/da93c5cf/HB1224.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/5/d/005d9d81/HB1224.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/c/0/abc00855/HB1224.180_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback