IN HB1208 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid settlement. Specifies that the distribution of funds from an opioid litigation settlement is subject to a bankruptcy court order or bankruptcy settlement. Provides that an annual distribution of less than $5,000 payable to a city or town pursuant to an opioid litigation settlement agreement must be paid instead to the county. (Under current law, the threshold is $1,000.) Specifies that amounts owed by the state for attorney's fees and costs incurred in connection with opioid litigation must be deducted from the opioid settlement distribution payable to the state. Permits a city, county, or town that receives an opioid litigation settlement payment to transfer all or part of the payment to another city, county, or town to be used for the benefit of both communities. Permits a city, county, or town that receives an opioid litigation distribution to sell the right to receive the distribution. Excludes from the agency settlement fund any amount owed for outside counsel attorney's fees, costs, or expenses.
Title
Opioid settlement.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | House | Representatives Steuerwald, Jeter C, GiaQuinta added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | House | Representative GiaQuinta removed as coauthor |
2023-01-12 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |