IN HB1205 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a school corporation to give public notice and hold a public meeting pertaining to a proposed superintendent employment contract. Provides that the public meeting must occur at least seven days before a contract for employment is entered. Provides that the governing body is not required to disclose the identity of the candidate for superintendent at the public meeting. Requires that the governing body shall post the provisions of a superintendent's employment contract on the school corporation's Internet web site. Requires a school corporation to post the provisions of an employment contract with a certificated employee that is not represented by an exclusive representative on the school corporation's Internet web site. Provides that after a governing body and the certified employees' exclusive representative have reached an agreement on a contract, the governing body shall post the contract on the school corporation's Internet web site. Requires the organizer of a charter school to publish the names of the members of the charter school's governing body on the school's Internet web site.
Title
School employee contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 21 (Crawford), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 10 (DeLaney), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 16 (Kersey), failed (Y: 36 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 21 (Crawford), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 10 (DeLaney), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Amendment 16 (Kersey), failed (Y: 36 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 410: yeas 76, nays 15 | |
2012-03-07 | Senator Rogers added as advisor | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Banks, Mrvan and Delph | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Kruse and Skinner | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Rhoads, Wesco, Kersey and V. Smith | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Behning and Porter | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 286: yeas 35 and nays 15 | |
2012-02-27 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Schneider), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Delph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Senator Banks added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Amendment 23 ( Behning) and prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 88, nays 6 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 17 (V. Smith), withdrawn | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 21 (Crawford), prevailed; Roll Call 82: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 10 (DeLaney), prevailed; Roll Call 81: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 16 (Kersey), failed; Roll Call 80: yeas 36, nays 56 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 22 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 19 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 18 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-13 | Representative Noe added as coauthor | |
2012-01-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representatives Rhoads and Wesco | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Behning |