IN HB1200 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a sentencing court to inform the department of correction (department) if the person sentenced is a credit restricted felon. Requires a court that determines that a person sentenced is a credit restricted felon to state in the sentencing order and the abstract of judgment that the person is a credit restricted felon. Requires the judicial conference to adopt rules concerning swift and certain sanctions that a probation officer may use in supervising persons on probation. Provides procedures for a person on probation to be sanctioned by a probation officer. Requires that credit time earned by certain offenders shall be reduced to the extent that application of the credit time would result in postconviction release or a community transition program assignment in less than 45 days after the person earns the credit time. Requires the department to: (1) establish an automated victim notification system; and (2) notify a registered crime victim of certain changes affecting the committed offender who committed the crime against the victim. Specifies when the department shall make certain victim notifications. Provides that if a court imposes a felony sentence that involves a commitment to the department, the court shall state certain information in the sentencing order and abstract of judgment. Provides that if a court orders probation for a person, the person, or in the case of a child, the child's parents, are responsible for certain costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various corrections matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-10 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2012-03-09 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 356: yeas 41, nays 8
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 405: yeas 89, nays 1
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-05 Senate advisor appointed: Wyss and Lanane
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Simpson
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: Koch, Behning, Pierce, White and GiaQuinta
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Foley and Porter
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-29 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-29 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 48 and nays 2
2012-02-23 Senator Lanane added as cosponsor
2012-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Simpson
2012-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 94, nays 3
2012-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-17 Representative Behning added as coauthor
2012-01-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2012-01-09 Coauthored by Representative Koch
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Foley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback