IN HB1188 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student teaching. Requires a student teaching agreement to include a provision requiring a student who is required to complete a student teaching requirement to be supervised by a certificated employee that has been rated as either highly effective or effective on the certificated employee's latest annual performance evaluation. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student teaching. Requires a student teaching agreement to include a provision requiring a student who is required to complete a student teaching requirement to be supervised by a certificated employee that has been rated as either highly effective or effective on the certificated employee's latest annual performance evaluation. Makes a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HousePublic Law 37
2015-04-17HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-26HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 328: yeas 44, nays 6
2015-03-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-01-27HouseSenator Rogers added second sponsor
2015-01-27HouseSenator Kruse added first sponsor
2015-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-01-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-20HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-12HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Smith V
2015-01-12HouseCoauthored by Representatives Behning and Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1188/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/4/4/a9442320/HB1188.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/4/4/5244be85/HB1188.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/a/7/22a7add5/HB1188.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/c/2/5fc26eb1/HB1188.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/e/6/09e69fc9/HB1188.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/a/7/3da77314/HB1188.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/e/b/efeb409b/HB1188.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/a/e/c4ae5f23/HB1188.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/f/4/92f450e1/HB1188.23.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/1/9/9b1965f5/HB1188.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/1/1cd1fbc9/HB1188.328.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback