IN HB1188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Precious metal and rental purchase agreements.
Title
Precious metal and rental purchase agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 222 |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 587: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 519: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as advisor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Buck and Broden |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Skinner |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Messmer and Hale |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Dermody and Riecken |
2013-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 46 and nays 2 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Charbonneau), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development & Technology |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 1 (Crouch), failed; voice vote |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2013-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Riecken |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Dermody |