IN HB1186 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance. Provides that any part of an unemployment insurance surcharge not used to pay interest on the advances made to the state from the federal unemployment trust fund must be credited against the total amount of benefits charged to the state's unemployment insurance trust fund before determining each employer's share of those benefits. Removes language that requires the extra surcharge amount be credited to each employer's experience account in proportion to the amount of the surcharge the employer paid. Requires the department of workforce development (department) to establish an unemployment benefit overpayment not later than four years from the
Title
Unemployment insurance. Provides that any part of an unemployment insurance surcharge not used to pay interest on the advances made to the state from the federal unemployment trust fund must be credited against the total amount of benefits charged to the state's unemployment insurance trust fund before determining each employer's share of those benefits. Removes language that requires the extra surcharge amount be credited to each employer's experience account in proportion to the amount of the surcharge the employer paid. Requires the department of workforce development (department) to establish an unemployment benefit overpayment not later than four years from the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Moseley) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Riecken) failed (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Moseley) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Riecken) failed (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 183 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 471: yeas 65, nays 20 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Boots) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 37, nays 8 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Representative Hamm added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Boots added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 69, nays 24 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 107: yeas 28, nays 67 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 106: yeas 28, nays 68 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment #1 (Moseley) prevailed; Roll Call 105: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendment #5 (Riecken) failed; Roll Call 104: yeas 30, nays 64 |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |