IN HB1183 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 281
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Towing services. Amends the statute concerning the release of an abandoned motor vehicle that has been towed to a storage yard or towing facility as follows: (1) Provides that a towing service or storage yard may charge an inspection fee for inspections or retrievals from a vehicle. (2) Requires a towing service or storage yard to: (A) provide an itemized receipt upon payment; and (B) meet certain requirements as to: (i) hours of operation; and (ii) receiving and returning telephone calls. Provides that not later than three business days after towing a vehicle a towing company or storage facility must comply with certain statutes relating to abandoned vehicles for giving notice. Requires a towing company to charge reasonable fees. Requires a towing company to provide the owner or operator of a motor vehicle that is about to be towed a written and itemized estimate of all charges and services to be performed by the towing company. Requires a towing company to document and itemize certain fees related to a tow and certain towing services. Specifies certain record keeping requirements for itemized estimates issued by a towing company. Creates a new article in the Indiana Code to establish certain requirements for towing companies that engage in, or offer to engage in, the business of providing towing service in Indiana, including provisions concerning the following: (1) Emergency towing. (2) Private property towing. (3) Releasing towed motor vehicles. (4) Prohibited acts by towing companies and storage facilities. Provides that a person who violates these new provisions commits a deceptive act that is: (1) actionable under; and (2) subject to the penalties and remedies set forth in; the statute governing deceptive consumer sales. Provides that the attorney general: (1) shall receive, and may investigate, complaints alleging violations of the new provisions; and (2) after finding that a violation has occurred, may take appropriate action under the statute governing deceptive consumer sales. Authorizes the attorney general to adopt rules to implement the new provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing services. Amends the statute concerning the release of an abandoned motor vehicle that has been towed to a storage yard or towing facility as follows: (1) Provides that a towing service or storage yard may charge an inspection fee for inspections or retrievals from a vehicle. (2) Requires a towing service or storage yard to: (A) provide an itemized receipt upon payment; and (B) meet certain requirements as to: (i) hours of operation; and (ii) receiving and returning telephone calls. Provides that not later than three business days after towing a vehicle a towing company or storage facility must comply with certain statutes relating to abandoned vehicles for giving notice. Requires a towing company to charge reasonable fees. Requires a towing company to provide the owner or operator of a motor vehicle that is about to be towed a written and itemized estimate of all charges and services to be performed by the towing company. Requires a towing company to document and itemize certain fees related to a tow and certain towing services. Specifies certain record keeping requirements for itemized estimates issued by a towing company. Creates a new article in the Indiana Code to establish certain requirements for towing companies that engage in, or offer to engage in, the business of providing towing service in Indiana, including provisions concerning the following: (1) Emergency towing. (2) Private property towing. (3) Releasing towed motor vehicles. (4) Prohibited acts by towing companies and storage facilities. Provides that a person who violates these new provisions commits a deceptive act that is: (1) actionable under; and (2) subject to the penalties and remedies set forth in; the statute governing deceptive consumer sales. Provides that the attorney general: (1) shall receive, and may investigate, complaints alleging violations of the new provisions; and (2) after finding that a violation has occurred, may take appropriate action under the statute governing deceptive consumer sales. Authorizes the attorney general to adopt rules to implement the new provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 52 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Glick) failed (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 281
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 566: yeas 52, nays 34
2019-04-18HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 481: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Glick) failed; Roll Call 464: yeas 19, nays 30
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Gaskill added as second sponsor
2019-03-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Doriot
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 86, nays 9
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Austin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #3 (Lindauer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representatives Mahan and Austin
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1183/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/7/9/ed792ef8/HB1183.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/7/5/5d75dbad/HB1183.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/4/5/1b45c551/HB1183.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/1/9/73191f47/HB1183.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/6/5/0e6505e3/HB1183.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/d/1/25d135b7/HB1183.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/c/5/abc5a32b/HB1183.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/b/e/6cbea385/HB1183.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/c/9/41c938de/HB1183.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/5/9db5dba7/HB1183.214.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/6/0/f76048b1/HB1183.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/6/9/e0695fe7/HB1183.464.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/1/a/f01a427f/HB1183.481.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/d/5/38d56a4e/HB1183.566.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback