IN HB1183 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianship; department of child services. Provides that a delegation of power by a properly executed power of attorney does not subject the parties to any laws, rules, or regulations concerning the licensing or regulation of foster family homes, child placing agencies, or child caring institutions. Prohibits a licensed foster family home from providing supervision to a child who is the subject of a power of attorney while providing overnight or regular and continuous care to a child placed in the foster family home unless the department of child services (department) grants an exception. Allows a parent to delegate the powers
Title
Guardianship; department of child services. Provides that a delegation of power by a properly executed power of attorney does not subject the parties to any laws, rules, or regulations concerning the licensing or regulation of foster family homes, child placing agencies, or child caring institutions. Prohibits a licensed foster family home from providing supervision to a child who is the subject of a power of attorney while providing overnight or regular and continuous care to a child placed in the foster family home unless the department of child services (department) grants an exception. Allows a parent to delegate the powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 74 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senators Kruse, Ford, Becker, Miller, Pat added as cosponsors |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as third sponsor |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second sponsor |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Representative Burton added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | House | Representatives Heaton, McNamara, Zent, Olthoff added as coauthors |
2016-02-02 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Buck |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Ziemke added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Nisly added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Representatives Bosma and Macer added as coauthors |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |