IN HB1174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a local government disposing agent may hire a broker to sell real property directly rather than using the bid process if: (1) the disposing agent publishes a notice of the determination to hire the broker; and (2) the property has been up for bid for at least 60 days before the broker is hired, and either no bids were received or the disposing agent has rejected all bids that were received. Provides that a political subdivision may sell real property to an abutting landowner without using a competitive bid process if the real property has not been assessed and the property was previously part of a public right-of-way. Allows a local government disposing agent to sell real property for less than 90% of the appraised value as determined by the average of the two appraisals of the property (instead of as determined by a joint appraisal of the property). Allows a local government disposing agent to sell real property for purposes of an economic development project or to facilitate compatible land use planning for a value that is not less than the appraised value as determined by the average of the two appraisals (instead of as determined by a joint appraisal of the property), if the agent publishes notice of the amount of the offer to be accepted. Allows a local government disposing agent to lease real property for a value that is less than 90% of the appraised fair market rental as determined by the average of the two appraisals (instead of as determined by a joint appraisal of the property), if the agent publishes notice of the amount of the bid to be accepted. Provides that if the disposing agent rejects all offers or bids, the agent must make a written determination for the rejection and explain why the bids or offers were rejected. Provides that a sale or transfer of property constituting a public easement or right of way under the statutes governing disposal of property by local government does not deprive a public utility of the use of the public easement or right of way if, at the time of the sale or transfer, the public utility is occupying and using all or part of that public easement or right of way for the location and operation of its facilities.
Title
Sale of real property by local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 188 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 660: yeas 89, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 47, nays 2 | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-15 | Representatives Dembowski and Steuerwald added as coauthors | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Walker | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment 2 (Burton), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Burton |