IN HB1171 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Apprentice plumbers. Allows an individual to register as a registered apprentice plumber and to work under a licensed plumbing contractor or journeyman plumber for one year, so long as the registered apprentice plumber has applied for acceptance into an apprenticeship program and is awaiting acceptance or has been placed on the program's waiting list. Provides that a registered apprentice plumber must discontinue working under a licensed plumbing contractor or journeyman plumber if certain events occur.
Title
Apprentice plumbers. Allows an individual to register as a registered apprentice plumber and to work under a licensed plumbing contractor or journeyman plumber for one year, so long as the registered apprentice plumber has applied for acceptance into an apprenticeship program and is awaiting acceptance or has been placed on the program's waiting list. Provides that a registered apprentice plumber must discontinue working under a licensed plumbing contractor or journeyman plumber if certain events occur.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 127 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 554: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 555: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Busch and Ford J.D. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Niezgodski |
2019-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Judy, Goodrich, DeVon, Lyness, Bartlett, Deal and Moseley |
2019-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Morris and Beck |
2019-04-10 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | House | Representative Heaton removed as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Busch |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2019-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Karickhoff, Heaton and Carbaugh |
2019-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |