IN HB1167 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes a provision that states the department of child services (department) is responsible for payment of any costs or expenses for housing or services provided to or for the benefit of a child placed by a juvenile court in a home or facility located outside Indiana only if the director of the department or the director's designee recommends or approves the placement. Provides that the department is responsible for these costs and expenses if a juvenile court places a child in a home or facility that is located outside Indiana and the: (1) juvenile court makes written findings based on clear and convincing evidence that the out-of- state placement is appropriate because there is not a comparable facility with adequate services located in Indiana, the location of the home or facility is within a distance not greater than 50 miles from the county of residence of the child, or the placement is recommended or approved by the director of the department or the director's designee; and (2) the placement is less expensive than similar services that can be provided in Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placement of children outside Indiana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-02-02 Representatives Pond and GiaQuinta added as coauthors
2010-02-02 Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Broden
2010-02-02 Referred to the Senate
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: Yeas 93, Nays 4
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-07 Coauthored by Representative L. Lawson
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Moses

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback