IN HB1163 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certificates of public convenience and necessity. Provides that: (1) a rural electric membership corporation (REMC); (2) a nonprofit corporation that is an electric cooperative and that has at least one member that is an REMC; and (3) certain corporations resulting from a merger or consolidation of an REMC and a telephone cooperative corporation; are exempt from the requirement that a public utility obtain a certificate of public convenience and necessity before beginning the construction, purchase, or lease of certain facilities to be used for furnishing public utility service.
Title
Certificates of public convenience and necessity.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hall [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Alex Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Gary Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Public Law 57 |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senator Byrne added as second sponsor |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2024-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2024-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Soliday, Zimmerman, Pierce M |