IN HB1157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Township budget. Provides the following with regard to a township that fails to fix its budget, tax rate, and tax levy, or submit its estimated budget and other information to the department of local government finance's computer gateway: (1) The township's most recent annual tax levy continues for the ensuing budget year. (2) The township board must adopt and the township trustee must approve a resolution to continue the township's most recent annual appropriations for the ensuing budget year. (Current law provides that both levy and appropriations continue for the ensuing budget year without any action by the township board and trustee.) Provides that if a resolution is not adopted and approved, all appropriations during the ensuing budget year must be approved by the township board on a monthly basis.
Title
Township budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Campbell [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers, Niezgodski, Ford J.D. |
2022-01-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Miller added as coauthor |
2022-01-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Campbell |