IN HB1157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Methamphetamine matters. Requires the division of state court administration to report certain methamphetamine-related felonies to the National Precursor Log Exchange (NPLEx) so that NPLEx can generate a stop sale alert to prevent individuals convicted of those felonies from purchasing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine.
Title
Methamphetamine matters. Requires the division of state court administration to report certain methamphetamine-related felonies to the National Precursor Log Exchange (NPLEx) so that NPLEx can generate a stop sale alert to prevent individuals convicted of those felonies from purchasing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine.
Sponsors
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 9 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 382: yeas 87, nays 1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | House | Representative Davisson added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young, M. |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 94, nays 3 |
2016-02-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Frizzell) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |