IN HB1152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance. Clarifies provisions concerning the overpayment of unemployment benefits resulting from fraud or failure to disclose wages and the forfeiture of benefits or wage credits.
Title
Unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed (Y: 13 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Austin) failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed (Y: 13 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Austin) failed (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Public Law 34 |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 239: yeas 13, nays 35 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Representative Miller added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #5 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 19: yeas 31, nays 66 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #3 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |