IN HB1148 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if all delinquent taxes and special assessments on real property (other than real property classified as industrial property under the rules of the department of local government finance) are paid before a tax sale after June 30, 2011, and before July 1, 2012: (1) the real property may not be sold at the tax sale; and (2) penalties and costs relating to the tax sale are not due on the real property. Waives penalties that were incurred before January 1, 2011, for delinquent property taxes on real property (other than industrial property) if all delinquent taxes and special assessments on the real property are paid before July 1, 2012.
Title
Tax sales and penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Representative V. Smith |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1148 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1148.1.html |