IN HB1145 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the judge of the Vanderburgh circuit court to appoint a second full-time magistrate. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the commission on courts.)
Title
Vanderburgh circuit court magistrate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 114502 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 114501 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 114502 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 114501 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Tomes added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Becker added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 182: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Recommitted to Ways and Means pursuant to rule 127 |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative Riecken |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Washburne. |