IN HB1142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax issues. Specifies that the legislative services agency (rather than the commission on state tax and financing policy or its successor committee, under current law) shall before October 1 of each year conduct the review, analysis, and evaluation of all tax incentives under House Enrolled Act 1020-2014, according to a schedule developed by the legislative services agency. Requires the legislative services agency to submit the results of the review, analysis, and evaluation to the legislative council and the interim study committee on fiscal policy. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy to hold an annual public hearing after September
Title
Tax issues. Specifies that the legislative services agency (rather than the commission on state tax and financing policy or its successor committee, under current law) shall before October 1 of each year conduct the review, analysis, and evaluation of all tax incentives under House Enrolled Act 1020-2014, according to a schedule developed by the legislative services agency. Requires the legislative services agency to submit the results of the review, analysis, and evaluation to the legislative council and the interim study committee on fiscal policy. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy to hold an annual public hearing after September
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Mike Braun [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Public Law 36 |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | Senator Hershman added as sponsor |
2015-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 94, nays 2 |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | Representatives Mayfield and DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-29 | House | Representatives Sullivan, Braun, Huston added as coauthors |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |