IN HB1135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology apprenticeships. Provides that an individual who completes a United States Department of Labor registered apprenticeship program to practice cosmetology may take the cosmetologist licensure examination and, upon passage of the examination, practice as a cosmetologist.
Title
Cosmetology apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Public Law 82 |
2024-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 277: yeas 66, nays 27 |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senators Walker G, Donato, Dernulc added as cosponsors |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as cosponsor |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senators Buchanan, Deery, Gaskill added as cosponsors |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third sponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Maxwell added as second sponsor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Rogers |
2024-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 74, nays 22 |
2024-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Amendment #1 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Representative Miller D added as coauthor |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | House | Representatives Pfaff and Criswell C added as coauthors |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Wesco |