IN HB1134 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that no fee may be charged to a parent or student for transportation to and from school if a school corporation provides transportation or contracts with an educational service center to provide transportation. Provides that parent supplemental transportation contracts do not apply to transportation provided by an educational service center. Makes a technical correction concerning school bus replacement plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-08 House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 373: yeas 84, nays 0
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Hume and Banks
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Rogers
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: Behning, Dermody and VanDenburgh
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Speedy and DeLaney
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-29 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-29 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 48 and nays 2
2012-02-27 Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
2012-02-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2012-02-09 Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-30 Senate sponsor: Senator Miller
2012-01-30 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 92, nays 2
2012-01-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-25 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2012-01-09 Coauthored by Representative DeLaney
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Speedy

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback