IN HB1132 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the resources of the Indianapolis housing trust fund to be used to fund programs considered appropriate to meet housing and community development needs of certain families. Requires a party filing a praecipe for a sheriff's sale to pay delinquent sewer liens on the property under certain circumstances. Requires the interim study committee on insurance to study certificates of release of liens on mortgaged property during the 2013 interim.
Title
Property matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 144 |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 536: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 344: yeas 44 and nays 5 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-02-19 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Representative Washburne removed as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Speedy and Washburne |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |