IN HB1128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the following qualify as a renewable energy resources for purposes of the statute that provides financial incentives for clean coal and energy projects: (1) Certain resources that qualify as clean energy resources for purposes of the statute governing the voluntary clean energy portfolio standard program .(2) Low temperature, oxygen starved gasification of municipal solid waste. (3) Methane recovered from landfills for the production of electricity.
Title
Renewable energy resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Kreg Battles [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 224 | |
2011-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 518: yeas 49, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 715: yeas 73, nays 25 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-26 | Senate advisors appointed: Merritt and R. Young | |
2011-04-26 | Senate conferees appointed: Gard and Randolph | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Lutz, Soliday and Pierce | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Koch and Battles | |
2011-04-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 446: yeas 40 and nays 10 | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 5 (Gard), prevailed; | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment 3 (Gard), prevailed; | |
2011-04-20 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Gard added as first sponsor | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Merritt removed as first sponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2011-02-07 | Senate sponsor: Senator Merritt | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 78, nays 18 | |
2011-02-03 | Representative Battles added as coauthor | |
2011-02-03 | Amendment 1 (Pierce), ruled out of order | |
2011-02-03 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Representative Koch |