IN HB1123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Child fatality reviews and commission on children.
Title
Child fatality reviews and commission on children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Yoder and Lanane |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment 3 (Kubacki), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2013-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Kubacki, Riecken and Summers |
2013-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan |