IN HB1119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physician order for scope of treatment and consent. Provides that the definition of "cardiopulmonary resuscitation" (CPR) that applies to a do not resuscitate declaration also applies to a physician order for scope of treatment (POST) form. Adds licensed dentists, home health aides, and physician assistants to the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of a POST form. Establishes a priority order for who may provide consent if an adult is incapable of providing consent to health care. Provides exceptions to the priority order. Provides that if the individuals at the same priority level disagree as to the health care
Title
Physician order for scope of treatment and consent. Provides that the definition of "cardiopulmonary resuscitation" (CPR) that applies to a do not resuscitate declaration also applies to a physician order for scope of treatment (POST) form. Adds licensed dentists, home health aides, and physician assistants to the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of a POST form. Establishes a priority order for who may provide consent if an adult is incapable of providing consent to health care. Provides exceptions to the priority order. Provides that if the individuals at the same priority level disagree as to the health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Public Law 67 |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 328: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senators Becker, Charbonneau, Leising added as cosponsors |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | House | Representatives Bacon and Brown, C. added as coauthors |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |