IN HB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Representatives Kirchhofer, Clere, Shackleford added as coauthors
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid nursing facility services. Extends the prohibition on the office of Medicaid policy and planning from including certain Medicaid recipients who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or a capitated managed care program through December 31, 2021. Includes Medicaid recipients who participate in certain waivers or reside in an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities setting in the prohibition of being placed into a risk based managed care program or capitated managed care program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid nursing facility services. Extends the prohibition on the office of Medicaid policy and planning from including certain Medicaid recipients who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or a capitated managed care program through December 31, 2021. Includes Medicaid recipients who participate in certain waivers or reside in an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities setting in the prohibition of being placed into a risk based managed care program or capitated managed care program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17HouseRepresentatives Kirchhofer, Clere, Shackleford added as coauthors
2019-01-14HouseRepresentative Clere removed as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representative Clere
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Karickhoff

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback