IN HB1110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health workforce student loan repayment program. Establishes the following: (1) The health workforce student loan repayment program (program). (2) The health workforce council (council). (3) The health workforce student loan repayment program fund (fund) for the purpose of providing funds to repay outstanding student loans of certain health providers who meet the program requirements. Provides that the professional licensing agency (agency) shall, in coordination with the council, administer the program. Establishes: (1) the imposition of fees at the time a license is issued or renewed for certain health profession licenses; and (2) qualifications to receive a student loan repayment award under the program. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2021: (1) each board may award loan repayment to an eligible applicant who is a provider licensed by the board; and (2) the council may award loan repayment to an eligible applicant who is an eligible provider. Requires, not later than July 1, 2022, and not later than July 1 every two years thereafter, the agency to submit a report concerning the program and fund to the governor and the general assembly. Provides that money from the fund is continuously appropriated. Repeals provisions concerning the following: (1) The primary care physician loan forgiveness program. (2) The mental health services development programs. (3) The dental underserved area and minority recruitment program.
Title
Health workforce student loan repayment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Manning |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1110/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/0/0/19006ea3/HB1110.01.INTR.pdf |