IN HB1099 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Low head dams. Requires the natural resources commission to establish a roster of low head dams in the state that are capable of creating hazardous currents that pose safety issues. Establishes requirements concerning low head dams for the department of natural resources (department) and owners of low head dams. Provides that an owner of at least two low head dams is exempt from certain requirements if that owner has previously installed warning signs, in coordination with the department, and maintains and repairs the existing signs. Except for purposes of an inspection, maintenance, or removal, prohibits a person from accessing a low head dam. Prohibits wading, boating, swimming, or accessing the waters within 50 feet of a low head dam when warning signs are present. Provides that the state is not liable for any death or injury that occurs on or resulting from a low head dam that is not owned by the state. Provides for a penalty for violations. Requires the department to prepare a report that includes recommendations concerning the creation of a low head dam removal program and any recommendations concerning low head dam safety legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low head dams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 104
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 319: yeas 81, nays 0
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenator Grooms added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Busch and Glick
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 97, nays 1
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Boy added as coauthor
2020-01-09HouseRepresentatives Eberhart and Abbott D added as coauthors
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Manning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1099/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/1/7/05176be4/HB1099.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/d/e/1ade72b0/HB1099.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/f/3/a4f370c0/HB1099.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/1/1/ed112de4/HB1099.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/4/0/58408beb/HB1099.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/2/2/152233f2/HB1099.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/d/c/19dc68bc/HB1099.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/9/4/20948171/HB1099.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/c/4/7dc41c7f/HB1099.83_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/1/1/4c11a2b6/HB1099.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/5/1/ad51b9d7/HB1099.221_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/2/2/dd22be32/HB1099.319_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback