IN HB1080 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Pension thirteenth checks.
Title
Pension thirteenth checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 101 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senators Landske and Hume added as cosponsors |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2013-02-12 | House | Representatives Clere, M. Smith, Morris, Kubacki, Soliday, Crouch, Richardson, Frizzell and Steuerwald added as coauthors |
2013-02-12 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-02-12 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2013-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Cherry added as coauthor |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2013-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative Niezgodski |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |