IN HB1077 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms matters. Repeals the law that requires a person to obtain a license to carry a handgun in Indiana. Specifies that certain persons who are not otherwise prohibited from carrying or possessing a handgun are not required to obtain or possess a license or permit from the state to carry a handgun in Indiana. Prohibits certain individuals from knowingly or intentionally carrying a handgun. Creates the crime of "unlawful carrying of a handgun" and specifies the penalties for committing this crime. Allows particular individuals who do not meet the requirements to receive a handgun license and are not otherwise prohibited to carry a handgun in limited places. Allows a resident of Indiana to obtain in certain circumstances a license to carry a handgun in Indiana. Makes theft of a firearm a Level 5 felony. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments and repeals obsolete provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House - Appeal the ruling of the chair (Gore) (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-11HouseRepresentative Borders added as coauthor
2022-01-11HouseRepresentatives Carbaugh, Lindauer, Engleman, Gutwein, Wesco, Teshka J, May, Behning, Heaton, Frye, Mayfield, Hostettler, Jeter C, Judy, Abbott D, Lauer, Barrett, Leonard, Cook, Davis M, Ledbetter C, VanNatter, Heine, Manning, Davisson J., Payne Z added as coauthors
2022-01-11HouseCosponsor: Senator Messmer
2022-01-11HouseRepresentative Snow C added as coauthor
2022-01-11HouseRule 105.2 suspended
2022-01-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Koch, Tomes, Houchin
2022-01-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 64, nays 29
2022-01-10HouseRepresentative Lucas added as coauthor
2022-01-10HouseAmendment #1 (Andrade) ruled out of order
2022-01-10HouseAppeal the ruling of the chair (Gore); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 5: yeas 66, nays 24
2022-01-10HouseAmendment #2 (Gore) ruled out of order
2022-01-10HouseAmendment #3 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-10HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-06HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2022-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representative Lehman
2022-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1077/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/6/8/50687fcc/HB1077.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/3/1/af314841/HB1077.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/b/9/f0b9fb68/HB1077.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/6/e/5f6e70f8/HB1077.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/1/1/9f11e37b/HB1077.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/5/b/305bdc2e/HB1077.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/0/6/3606b40c/HB1077.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/c/1/c6c1f718/HB1077.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/0/1/d601ecff/HB1077.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/3/a/803a533c/HB1077.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/e/5/79e590b0/HB1077.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/c/d/90cdc680/HB1077.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/6/8/a368e18a/HB1077.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/1/b/821b7318/HB1077.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/a/6/06a6e8b2/HB1077.5_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/9/3/b2932793/HB1077.8_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback