IN HB1069 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No contact and protective orders and battery. Allows a petition to be filed with the juvenile court to order a person to refrain from contact with a member of a foster family home. Makes battery a Class A misdemeanor instead of a Class B misdemeanor if the offense is committed against a member of a foster family home by a person who is not a resident of the foster family home if the person who committed the offense is a relative of a person who lived in the foster family home at the time of the offense. Makes the offense
Title
No contact and protective orders and battery. Allows a petition to be filed with the juvenile court to order a person to refrain from contact with a member of a foster family home. Makes battery a Class A misdemeanor instead of a Class B misdemeanor if the offense is committed against a member of a foster family home by a person who is not a resident of the foster family home if the person who committed the offense is a relative of a person who lived in the foster family home at the time of the offense. Makes the offense
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 65 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 2 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the House; Roll Call 454: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | House rescinds adoption of CCR 1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 435: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 416: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 403: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate rescinds adoption of CCR 1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 2 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crider, Taylor and Holdman |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Glick and Broden |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, McNamara and Hale |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Zent and Lawson L |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as third sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Young R Michael) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 26, nays 20 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Representatives Washburne and McNamara added as coauthors |
2016-01-28 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |