IN HB1065 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband grants and high speed Internet service. Authorizes the office of community and rural affairs (office) to award grants to qualified broadband providers in connection with qualified broadband projects involving the deployment of infrastructure to provide qualified broadband service in unserved areas in Indiana. Defines "qualified broadband service" as a connection to the Internet at an actual speed of at least 10 megabits per second downstream and at least one megabit per second upstream, regardless of the technology used. Defines an "unserved area" as a geographic area in Indiana in which there is not at least one provider of terrestrial
Title
Broadband grants and high speed Internet service. Authorizes the office of community and rural affairs (office) to award grants to qualified broadband providers in connection with qualified broadband projects involving the deployment of infrastructure to provide qualified broadband service in unserved areas in Indiana. Defines "qualified broadband service" as a connection to the Internet at an actual speed of at least 10 megabits per second downstream and at least one megabit per second upstream, regardless of the technology used. Defines an "unserved area" as a geographic area in Indiana in which there is not at least one provider of terrestrial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 177 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 412: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 420: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph Lonnie M added as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Stoops removed as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph Lonnie M removed as advisor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Randolph Lonnie M, Messmer, Merritt and Buchanan |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Houchin and Stoops |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Negele, DeVon and Pierce |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Ober and Hatfield |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 311: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Glick added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senators Merritt, Leising, Buchanan, Messmer, Randolph added as cosponsors |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Houchin and Koch |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Division of the House: yeas 33, nays 53 |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Representative Pelath added as coauthor |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2018-01-03 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Negele and Hatfield |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Ober |